Lattice Multiplication
Page 4 of 4

Let's do one with bigger numbers!

247 x 38

Get it set up!

lattice for 247 x 38


Make your matches
and multiply:

2 x 3, 4 x 3

7 x 3, 2 x 8

4 x 8, 7 x 8

lattice multiplication work for 247 x 38


Start at the bottom and add down the diagonal stripes...  But, look what happens when we hit the yellow diagonal stripe!

lattice multiplication work for 247 x 38


We get a two digit answer...  So, we just need to carry into the next diagonal stripe.  It's the same thing we do with regular addition!

lattice multiplication work for 247 x 38


Now, finish it off!

lattice multiplication work for 247 x 38

247 x 38 = 9386

 Pretty cool, huh?  Try some yourself!  You can check your answers using a calculator or the regular way of multiplying.

Pages